open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00906
    Party Name:Lors v. Papoosha et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133911
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =