open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00895
    Party Name:Boyd v. Connecticut et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order (Self-Rep)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Electronic Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133907
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =