open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00903
    Party Name:Gulley v. Bujnicki et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re: Insufficiency]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133909
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =