open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00909
    Party Name:Interstate Billing Service, Inc. v. Precise Medical Billings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Writ]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Good Standing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on ExParte Motion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [ExParte Motion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133906
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =