open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00908
    Party Name:Carmichael v. Advanced Nursing & Rehabilitation Center of New Haven LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Conference]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conference]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?133901
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =