open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01260
    Party Name:Moure et al v. Federal Deposit Insuronce Corp et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to Appeal]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Recommended Ruling]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance Self Represented Party]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Electronic Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135262
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =