open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01265
    Party Name:United National Insurance Company v. MNR Hotel Group/363 Roberts Partners, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135263
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =