open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01267
    Party Name:United Rentals, Inc. et al v. Harrington
  • Filing Type:Civil [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Re: Chambers Practices]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135277
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =