open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01266
    Party Name:Stewart et al v. Ferrao et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Transfer]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Service Documents]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request to Issue Summons]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135269
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =