U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01566
  • Case Name: Maio v. Datto, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2024: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • October 02, 2024: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 01, 2024: [Request to Issue Summons]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • September 30, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.