U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01394
  • Case Name: Wood v. New Haven D.O.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling]
  • April 22, 2025: [Recommended Ruling]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reopen Case]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2024: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order re: Insufficiency]
  • October 07, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.