Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:19-10076-
    Party Name:David Leroy McDonald
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [341 Meeting Not Held and Continued]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Confirmation Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [VAN-309 Ch 12/13 Order - Special]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [341 Meeting Held and Continued]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Appearance - Notice]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Financial Management Certificate]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.deb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?175546
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =