Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:19-10075-
    Party Name:Justin E. Bickling and Christina M. Bickling
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Substitution of Counsel - Notice]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Allow Plan Distribution - Motion]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [VAN-308 Ch 13 For Final Confirmation]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Confirmation Hearing Held - Final Confirmation]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Confirmation Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [VAN-309 Ch 12/13 Order - Special]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [341 Meeting Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Certification About a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Appearance - Notice]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Joseph, - Chapter 13 Trustee Michael B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Request for Service of Notices]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.deb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?175545
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =