Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00073
    Party Name:Sonn v. First Premier Bank et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?67436
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =