Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00504
    Party Name:Smith v. Synchrony Bank et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68085
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =