Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00501
    Party Name:TPP Tech LLC v. Sato America, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68083
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =