open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01299
    Party Name:Kooker v. Baker et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69417
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =