open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01297
    Party Name:Hillandale Farms Conn, LLC v. Moark, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - General]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69414
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =