open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01296
    Party Name:Sloven v. Catholic Diocese of Wilmington et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [No Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69413
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =