open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01511
    Party Name:Baines v. May et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - PLRA for Pay Authorization]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Prisoner 1983]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [PLRA - Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69730
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =