open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01508
    Party Name:PureWick Corporation v. Sage Products, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Oral Order]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Fail to State Claim]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69729
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =