open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

DELAWARE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01509
    Party Name:Steven Madden, Ltd. v. Rothys, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Amended]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SO ORDERED]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Exexuted - 60 day ddl]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Consent Forms]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ded.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69727
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =