Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Stayed]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-00054
    Party Name:HOOMEHR et al v. JOHNSON et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?183762

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 2 =