Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00049
    Party Name:KRUISE v. JORGENSEN
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26a1 Statement]
    Date Published:April 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Denied]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:March 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [CM/ECF Password]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?203300
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =