Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:18-cv-02411
    Party Name:BROWDER v. ESPER
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to Agency]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Administrative Record]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?201067
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =