open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00347
    Party Name:COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al v. NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION BOARD
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of QC]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26a1 Statement]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204131
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =