open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01707
    Party Name:SNEDGEN v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORPORATION
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?208205
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =