open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01683
    Party Name:DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY v. BAKER
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel/Party]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?208207
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =