open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01706
    Party Name:PACE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Fox/Neal Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel/Party]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?208202
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =