open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01705
    Party Name:SNOW v. TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Stayed]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?208195
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =