open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01688
    Party Name:SOUVANNASOT v. HARVEY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Denied]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Pro Se Case]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?208185
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =