open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02443
    Party Name:SAVIGNAC et al v. JONES DAY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [CM/ECF Password]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210211
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =