open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02461
    Party Name:THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210210
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =