open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02462
    Party Name:COGDELL v. MURPHY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210222
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =