open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03647
    Party Name:RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC v. CUCCINELLI et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213414
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =