Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:15-cv-01580
    Party Name:JOHNSON et al v. COMMISSION ON PRESIDENTIAL DEBATES et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Take Judicial Notice]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion For Order]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Summons to Issue]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174075
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =