Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:03-cr-00289-2
    Party Name:United States of America v. Partee et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re First Step Act]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act of 2018]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail returned]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order pursuant to the First Step Act of 2018]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Amendement 782 / Crack Cocaine Offense - 18 USC Section 3582]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing the Federal Public Defender for Amendment 782 proceedings]
    Date Published:June 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence re Amendment 782 / Crack Cocaine Offense - 18 USC Section 3582]
    Date Published:February 03, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?22676
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =