Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:97-cr-00140-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Cusidor et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Amendement 782 / Crack Cocaine Offense - 18 USC Section 3582]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of substitution of AUSA]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence re Amendment 782 / Crack Cocaine Offense - 18 USC Section 3582]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing the Federal Public Defender for Amendment 782 proceedings]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal ]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42192
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =