Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond & Closing Estate (incl. Conditional)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [(NO PAPER) - Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090-
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cohen, Aaron R. [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:3:17-bk-00090
    Party Name:Christine A. Davis and David H. Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1224562

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 1 =