Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Trustee's Request for Order Confirming Plan [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Notice of Requirement to File a Certificate of Completion of a Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Compliance and Request for Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Voluntary Petition Ch 13 [ECF]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:17-10302-
    Party Name:Lisen Rowena Allocca
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weiner, Robin R [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?710007

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 3 =