Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:17-cv-02391
    Party Name:Cook v. Polk County School Board
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of mediation conference/hearing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of appearance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Party]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion to stay]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Suggestion of]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order appointing mediator/scheduling mediation]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case management and scheduling order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Report]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for extension of time to answer]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?342378

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 1 =