Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:17-cv-02677
    Party Name:Pitts v. Polk County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order directing service by USM]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of change of address]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for leave to proceed In forma pauperis]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Related case order and track 1 notice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343304

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 1 =