Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons returned executed]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Response to order to show cause]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Order to show cause]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Related case order and track 2 notice]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:18-cv-00911
    Party Name:Hatfield v. Polk County Parks
    Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?349190

Post Your Comment or Question

3 x 3 =