Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00014-1
    Party Name:USA v. Graddy
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proof of publication]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of plea]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to institute presentence investigation report]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of maximum penalty]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of rescheduling hearing (time only)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for detention]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to appoint counsel]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery ]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel ]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of particulars]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?358989
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =