Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00096
    Party Name:Montagnino et al v. SRA Associates, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order dismissing case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of settlement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of appearance]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons returned executed]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of designation of track]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?359043
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =