Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cv-00462
    Party Name:SOSS2, Inc. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Intervene]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of designation of track]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Division transfer in]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to counsel]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Division transfer out]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order transferring case to another division]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of appearance]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proof of service]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to show cause]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed summons]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?359041
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =