Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-bk-00269-
    Party Name:Judith Ann Madden
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [(NO PAPER) - Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [(NO PAPER) - Rescheduled Meeting for Non-Appearance]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Carapella, Dawn A [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1274010
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =