Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-bk-00268-
    Party Name:Charlotte Ann Newton
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [TRUSTEE - Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 (not for conversions, supplemental) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Order Dismissing Case (BK cases only)]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Certificate of Mailing Chapter 13/12 Plan Upon All or Additional Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 13]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Remick, Kelly [Administrative Order FLMB-2018-2 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Prior Bankruptcy Case(s)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Certificate Regarding Domestic Support Obligation - 1328(a)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1274009
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =