Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-10457-
    Party Name:Hugh McGinley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Close Bankruptcy Case with Final Decree [Ch 7 No Asset]]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Auto Discharge of Debtor(s) [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Barmat, Marc P [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?742886
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =