Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:1:18-cr-20989-1
    Party Name:USA v. Doekhie et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning/Transferring Case]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release of Funds]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Clarification]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clarification]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Bond]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointment/Report Re: Counsel Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT SDO txt)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Unseal]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?541460
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =